This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/28/2020 at 11:05:59 (UTC).

STATE VS CARINO JOSEPH R

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARINO JOSEPH R. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

CARINO JOSEPH RAYMOND

Los Angeles, CA 90013-2116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

03/06/2020: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

01/31/2020: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

01/31/2020: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

01/31/2020: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

01/31/2020: SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 365.16.1.D; Charge Description: HARASSING PHONE CALLS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: CARINO JOSEPH RAYMOND; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1690552; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 03/05/2020; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: UNSERVED; Unserved Reason: UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 365.16.1.D; Charge Description: HARASSING PHONE CALLS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 365.16.1.D; Charge Description: HARASSING PHONE CALLS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less