This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/17/2020 at 08:01:40 (UTC).

STATE VS CARACCIOLO JANNA M

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARACCIOLO JANNA M. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH E ATKIN and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH E ATKIN

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

CARACCIOLO JANNA MARIE

Rockledge, FL 32955-3609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT

02/20/2020: CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT

JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

01/17/2020: JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

01/17/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

REPORTING SCHEDULE FOR FARM OR JAIL

01/17/2020: REPORTING SCHEDULE FOR FARM OR JAIL

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/17/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/17/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

01/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/18/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COURT INFORMATION SHEET

11/25/2019: COURT INFORMATION SHEET

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CO; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CERT & RECD ORDER CO; Amount Assessed: $13.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 817.565.1.A; Charge Description: WILLFULLY DEFRAUD ATT DEFRAUD URINE DRUG TEST; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: CARACCIOLO JANNA MARIE; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688881; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 12/17/2019; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 817.565.1.A; Charge Description: WILLFULLY DEFRAUD ATT DEFRAUD URINE DRUG TEST; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/17/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 817.565.1.A; Charge Description: WILLFULLY DEFRAUD ATT DEFRAUD URINE DRUG TEST; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less