This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 02:43:07 (UTC).

STATE VS BUZALSKI RIKILEE A

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BUZALSKI RIKILEE A. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

BUZALSKI RIKILEE AMANDA

Melbourne, FL 32935-2729

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

07/23/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

07/16/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

06/02/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

03/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/22/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

04/16/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

03/26/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/12/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/12/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

03/12/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

03/12/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

03/12/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/09/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/09/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

03/09/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

02/17/2020: INFORMATION

AMENDED ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/12/2020: AMENDED ARREST AFFIDAVIT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:JURY TRIAL; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: pds74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCAL:JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:CALENDAR CALL; Court Room Description: MELBOURNE COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: pds74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCAL:CALENDAR CALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: JURY TRIAL; Result: CR: JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCR: JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: CALENDAR CALL; Result: CR: CALENDAR CALL CONTD BY CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NOT GUILTY- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.081.2.D; Charge Description: ASSAULT OR THREAT SPECIFIED OFFICIALS OR EMPLOYEE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.081.2.D; Charge Description: ASSAULT OR THREAT SPECIFIED OFFICIALS OR EMPLOYEE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.081.2.D; Charge Description: ASSAULT OR THREAT SPECIFIED OFFICIALS OR EMPLOYEE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less