This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

STATE VS BRAGG JOHN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRAGG JOHN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBIN C LEMONIDIS, DAVID C KOENIG and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBIN C LEMONIDIS

DAVID C KOENIG

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

BRAGG JOHN WESLEY DOC Number - 423482

Palm Bay, FL 32907-9488

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/31/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

01/31/2020: COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/31/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/31/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 322.34.2C; Charge Description: DRIVING W LIC SUSP REV CANC W KNOWLEDGE 3RD CONVIC; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Citation Number: 2020AD4MSLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 322.34.2C; Charge Description: DRIVING W LIC SUSP REV CANC W KNOWLEDGE 3RD CONVIC; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCitations: Agency: MELBOURNE POLICE DEPT; Officer: AIANI JOSEPH- Badge 4486; Citation Number: 2020AD4MSLE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 1774YE; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: BUICK; Color: WH; Year: 2004

    Read MoreRead Less