This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 11:48:29 (UTC).

STATE VS BERNER JULIA RENEE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BERNER JULIA RENEE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

BERNER JULIA RENEE

Titusville, FL 32780-2627

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF COUNSEL

02/17/2020: WAIVER OF COUNSEL

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

02/17/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

02/17/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT

02/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 1)

01/31/2020: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 1)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTION TR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $50.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: NONMOVING 322 & 320; Amount Assessed: $119.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $119.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: T781258; Party: D 1; Event Description: PMT: COP PROSECUTE TRAFFIC; Amount: $50.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BERNER JULIA RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: T781258; Party: D 1; Event Description: PMT: NONMOVING VIOL 322 & 320; Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BERNER JULIA RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDHSMV DISPOSITION TRANSMITTED- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketASM: NONMOVING VIOL 322 & 320- (Count 1); Amount: 119.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketDISPO: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NOLO CONTENDERE- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 1); Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 322.15.1; Charge Description: DRIVERS LICENSE NOT CARRIED OR EXHIBITED ON DEMAND; Class: INFRACTION; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE; Disposition Date: 02/17/2020; Final Disposition: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD; Citation Number: 2020A3DQNUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 322.34.2C; Charge Description: DRIVING W LIC SUSP REV CANC W KNOWLEDGE 3RD CONVIC; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Penalties: Count: 1; Due Date: 03/18/2020; Charge Description: DRIVERS LICENSE NOT CARRIED OR EXHIBITED ON DEMAND; Presumptive Amount: $119.00; Reduced Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCitations: Agency: TITUSVILLE POLICE DEPT; Officer: WEAVER JACOB- Badge 140; Citation Number: 2020A3DQNUP; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: NDKT9R; Body Type: TRUCK; Make: CHEV; Color: GY; Year: 2003

    Read MoreRead Less