This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:16:19 (UTC).

STATE VS BENWELL TYLER JAMES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BENWELL TYLER JAMES. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBIN C LEMONIDIS, MICHELLE A BAKER, KATHRYN C JACOBUS, DAVID C KOENIG and BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBIN C LEMONIDIS

MICHELLE A BAKER

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

DAVID C KOENIG

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

BENWELL TYLER JAMES DOC Number - E40747

Merritt Island, FL 32952-5124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

RUSSELL KURT A

175 E Nasa Blvd Ste 300

Melbourne, FL 32901-1998

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/09/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

ORDER COURT FOUND JUVENILE IN VIOLATION OF PROBATION

03/09/2020: ORDER COURT FOUND JUVENILE IN VIOLATION OF PROBATION

ORDER COURT FOUND JUVENILE IN VIOLATION OF PROBATION

03/09/2020: ORDER COURT FOUND JUVENILE IN VIOLATION OF PROBATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/03/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/01/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

03/01/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

03/01/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

ORDER OF IMMOBILIZATION

01/28/2020: ORDER OF IMMOBILIZATION

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

01/28/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

01/28/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

SCORESHEET

01/28/2020: SCORESHEET

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

01/07/2020: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

12/16/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

INFORMATION

12/16/2019: INFORMATION

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

12/06/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

12/11/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/11/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

12/05/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMESTOP W/CLK TRAF; Amount Assessed: $20.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: DUI 2ND/4TH UNDR BAL; Amount Assessed: $1,000.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: TR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: TRAFFIC CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CIR; Amount Assessed: $132.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $132.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: ST RADIO TR FUND TRF; Amount Assessed: $3.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 642579; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: AS6K664090; Amount: $1,000.00; Status: RELEASED; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 2); Amount: 2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: SHEHAN KARL- Badge 4598; Citation Number: 2019A2GDU4P; Vehicle License: DCUG53; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: SUBA; Color: GR; Year: 2009

    Read MoreRead Less