This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/17/2020 at 14:59:22 (UTC).

STATE VS ANTONELLI JESSICA M

Case Summary

On 12/28/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ANTONELLI JESSICA M. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY MAHL, MICHELLE A BAKER, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY MAHL

MICHELLE A BAKER

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

ANTONELLI JESSICA MARIE

Palm Bay, FL 32907-7060

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

WISOKER STEVEN

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way

Viera, FL 32940-

 

Court Documents

PLEA AGREEMENT AND ORDER

02/25/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT AND ORDER

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

02/25/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

02/25/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

SCORESHEET

02/25/2020: SCORESHEET

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

02/25/2020: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

01/24/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

INFORMATION

01/24/2020: INFORMATION

SURETY BOND- (Count 7)

01/09/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 7)

SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

01/09/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

01/09/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

01/01/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/31/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

12/28/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

12/28/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

12/28/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

12/28/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

12/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

12/28/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CI; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI MELBOURNE CIR; Amount Assessed: $310.20; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $310.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $4.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE DOES NOT EXIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less