This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 11:29:32 (UTC).

STATE VS ALONSO RODRIGUEZ RAY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALONSO RODRIGUEZ RAY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY MAHL, KELLY INGRAM and DAVID C KOENIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY MAHL

KELLY INGRAM

DAVID C KOENIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

ALONSO RODRIGUEZ RAY

Orlando, FL 32822-8045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

RIVAS JOSE I

2307 Lee Rd

Winter Park, FL 32789-1749

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

02/27/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

ORDER ALLOWING TRAVEL

02/10/2020: ORDER ALLOWING TRAVEL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

02/05/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/03/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

CASH BOND- (Count 1)

02/03/2020: CASH BOND- (Count 1)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/01/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

01/31/2020: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDSB: REFUND; Amount: 3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: T782043; Party: D 1; Memo: BOND 2020CF13945A; Event Description: PMT: REFUND; Amount: $3,000.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ALONSO RODRIGUEZ RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketREFUND IN PROCESS- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDSB: DEDUCT BOND; Amount: 3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 3; Control Number: 175726; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $3,000.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: DEDUCT FROM BOND; Payee Name: BREVARD COUNTY CLERK OF COURT; Payee Address1: C/O SCOTT ELLIS CLERK OF COURT; Payee Address2: 700 S PARK AVE BLDG B; Payee City State Zip: TITUSVILLE FL 327804001; Check Amount: $3,000.00; Check Date: 03/24/2020; Check Number: 176624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 3; Control Number: 175726; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $3,000.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: DEDUCT FROM BOND; Payee Name: BREVARD COUNTY CLERK OF COURT; Payee Address1: C/O SCOTT ELLIS CLERK OF COURT; Payee Address2: 700 S PARK AVE BLDG B; Payee City State Zip: TITUSVILLE FL 327804001; Check Amount: $3,000.00; Check Date: 03/24/2020; Check Number: 176624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.80.2; Charge Description: NONCONFORMING FUEL TANK FRAUDULENTLY OBTAIN FUEL; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 02/27/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR; Citation Number: 2020A3HWN6P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.80.2; Charge Description: NONCONFORMING FUEL TANK FRAUDULENTLY OBTAIN FUEL; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 645290; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Number: 202000003139; Amount: $3,000.00; Status: DEDUCT FROM BOND; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 645290; Bond Type: CASH BOND; Bond Number: 202000003139; Amount: $3,000.00; Status: DEDUCT FROM BOND; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCASH BOND ORDER/CREATE- (Count 1); Amount: 3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: GARCIA GABRIEL- Badge 4632; Citation Number: 2020A3HWN6P; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: IN24BD; Body Type: TRUCK; Make: INTL; Color: RD; Year: 2005

    Read MoreRead Less