This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 09:45:39 (UTC).

STATE VS ALLEYNE ARTHUR ANAND

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALLEYNE ARTHUR ANAND. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU, RHONDA E. BABB and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

RHONDA E. BABB

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

ALLEYNE ARTHUR ANAND

Palm Bay, FL 32908-1236

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/31/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/31/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

01/31/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/31/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less