This case was last updated from Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/02/2022 at 19:43:07 (UTC).

STATE VS DAVIS RASHAD ELIJAH E

Case Summary

On 09/24/2022 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS RASHAD ELIJAH E. This case was filed in Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHRYN C JACOBUS, CHARLES G CRAWFORD and MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

CHARLES G CRAWFORD

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

DAVIS RASHAD ELIJAH EMMANUEL

Palm Bay, FL 32908-3401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

MARTINEZ DANIEL J

3565 Jupiter Blvd Se Ste 2

Palm Bay, FL 32909-3893

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/24/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

09/24/2022: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/25/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

09/26/2022: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

09/26/2022: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

10/03/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/03/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

10/04/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

MOTION TO DETERMINE INDIGENCY FOR COSTS

11/07/2022: MOTION TO DETERMINE INDIGENCY FOR COSTS

ORDER DETERMINING INDIGENCE COST

11/07/2022: ORDER DETERMINING INDIGENCE COST

INFORMATION

11/18/2022: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

11/18/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: CHARLES G CRAWFORD; User: cat66

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6B; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF LESS THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 827.03.3.A.2.C; Charge Description: NEGLECT OF CHILD; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DETERMINING INDIGENCE COST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DETERMINE INDIGENCY FOR COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6B; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF LESS THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 827.03.3.A.2.C; Charge Description: NEGLECT OF CHILD; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6B; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF LESS THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 827.03.2.D; Charge Description: CHILD NEGLECT WITHOUT GREAT BODILY HARM; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CHILD ABUSE; Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ DANIEL J