This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 02:07:59 (UTC).

STATE VS DELGADO LEONARDO A JR

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DELGADO LEONARDO A JR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID DUGAN and DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID DUGAN

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

DELGADO LEONARDO ALBERTO JR

West Melbourne, FL 32904-4903

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

GOLUB GEOFFREY

512 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6838

 

Court Documents

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

05/20/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

04/21/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

04/21/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/24/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

03/24/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

02/22/2022: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/03/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/03/2022: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

02/03/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

01/13/2022: ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/13/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

01/13/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/12/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

01/11/2022: INFORMATION

CASH BOND- (Count 1)

01/03/2022: CASH BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

12/24/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

12/24/2021: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; User: mal97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 877.03; Charge Description: BREACH OF PEACE DISORDERLY CONDUCT; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 843.02; Charge Description: RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 877.03; Charge Description: BREACH OF PEACE DISORDERLY CONDUCT; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 843.02; Charge Description: RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUB GEOFFREY