This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/28/2021 at 11:07:46 (UTC).

STATE VS HORNE ROBERT LLOYD

Case Summary

On 02/21/2021 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HORNE ROBERT LLOYD. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY INGRAM, RHONDA E. BABB, KATHRYN C JACOBUS and DAVID C KOENIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY INGRAM

RHONDA E. BABB

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

DAVID C KOENIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

HORNE ROBERT LLOYD

Melbourne, FL 32935-8724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

ALBERT JOHN JOSEPH

6032 Farcenda Pl Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-7341

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

03/11/2021: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

03/03/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

03/02/2021: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/02/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO LIFT NO CONTACT ORDER

03/01/2021: MOTION TO LIFT NO CONTACT ORDER

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

02/27/2021: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

02/25/2021: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

ORDER SETTING BOND

02/22/2021: ORDER SETTING BOND

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/22/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/22/2021: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/22/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/22/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/22/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/21/2021: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:45 AM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:45 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#14) INCOURT GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/11/2021; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALBERT JOHN JOSEPH