This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/05/2021 at 11:33:24 (UTC).

STATE VS EVANS TODD MATHEW

Case Summary

On 02/21/2021 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EVANS TODD MATHEW. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS JAMES BROWN and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

EVANS TODD MATHEW

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/15/2021: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

03/15/2021: JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

03/15/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

03/09/2021: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/22/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/22/2021: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/22/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/22/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/22/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/21/2021: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CO; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CERT & RECD ORDER CO; Amount Assessed: $13.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: ADDL CT CLEAR COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $3.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/15/2021; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.2.B-A; Charge Description: TRESPASS FAIL LEAVE PROPERTY UPON WARNING BY OWNER; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant