This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/06/2021 at 11:38:43 (UTC).

STATE VS RUSSO JONATHAN JAMES

Case Summary

On 02/21/2021 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RUSSO JONATHAN JAMES. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY INGRAM and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY INGRAM

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

RUSSO JONATHAN JAMES DOC Number - E18044

Palm Bay, FL 32907-7907

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/29/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/29/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

03/29/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

03/22/2021: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/15/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

03/15/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/22/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/22/2021: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/22/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/22/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/22/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/21/2021: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MELBOURNE COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: skf93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPLEA: NOT GUILTY- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03-A; Charge Description: BATTERY; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03-A; Charge Description: BATTERY; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1-A; Charge Description: BATTERY; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant