This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:04:52 (UTC).

STATE VS MESSINEO BRITTANY N

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MESSINEO BRITTANY N. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

MESSINEO BRITTANY NICOLE DOC Number - E48680

Cocoa, FL 32926-4646

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

COURT MINUTES REGARDING OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

09/29/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $1,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARREST PPWK/BOND/CHECK MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COURT MINUTES REGARDING OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDISPO: DISMISSED- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NONE- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCAL:OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 657827; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: U520974458; Amount: $1,000.00; Status: OUT OF COUNTY RELEASED; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 901.04; Charge Description: OUT OF COUNTY ARREST; Class: NOT APPLICABLE; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE; Disposition Date: 09/29/2020; Final Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 901.04; Charge Description: OUT OF COUNTY ARREST; Class: NOT APPLICABLE; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less