This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/19/2020 at 10:08:09 (UTC).

STATE VS LAZARO RONALD JOHN

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LAZARO RONALD JOHN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS JAMES BROWN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

LAZARO RONALD JOHN DOC Number - K58710

Fort Pierce, FL 34982-7205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#14) CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#13) PLEA AGREEMENT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#12) ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#11) COURT MINUTES REGARDING OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDISPO: DISMISSED- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NONE- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCAL:OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 901.04; Charge Description: OUT OF COUNTY ARREST; Class: NOT APPLICABLE; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE; Disposition Date: 10/09/2020; Final Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 901.04; Charge Description: OUT OF COUNTY ARREST; Class: NOT APPLICABLE; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less