This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/06/2020 at 11:42:37 (UTC).

BREVARD CO VS COX DONALD LEE

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 BREVARD CO filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COX DONALD LEE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BREVARD COUNTY

C/O Brevard County Attorney'S Office, 2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg Suite 308

Viera, FL 32940

Defendants

COX DONALD LEE

Mims, FL 32754-5616

COX DONALD LEE DOC Number - V25805

Mims, FL 32754-5616

 

Court Documents

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INFRACTION HEARING

01/07/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INFRACTION HEARING

OFFICER NOTIFICATION SENT

12/17/2019: OFFICER NOTIFICATION SENT

CLERK ACTION FORM

12/04/2019: CLERK ACTION FORM

CORRESPONDENCE (JUDICIAL)

12/04/2019: CORRESPONDENCE (JUDICIAL)

CORRESPONDENCE

12/04/2019: CORRESPONDENCE

OFFICER NOTIFICATION OF HEARINGS RETURNED SIGNED

11/27/2019: OFFICER NOTIFICATION OF HEARINGS RETURNED SIGNED

OFFICER NOTIFICATION SENT

11/18/2019: OFFICER NOTIFICATION SENT

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/14/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

REQUEST FOR HEARING

11/14/2019: REQUEST FOR HEARING

ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 6)

11/01/2019: ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 6)

ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 5)

11/01/2019: ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 5)

ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 4)

11/01/2019: ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 4)

ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 3)

11/01/2019: ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 3)

ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 2)

11/01/2019: ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 2)

ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 1)

11/01/2019: ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION CITATION- (Count 1)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: INFRACTION HEARING; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INFRACTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDISPO: DISMISSED- (Count 6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NONE- (Count 6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDISPO: DISMISSED- (Count 5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NONE- (Count 5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDISPO: DISMISSED- (Count 4)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NONE- (Count 4)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDISPO: DISMISSED- (Count 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 828.30-A-1; Charge Description: AC 14 54 B FAIL TO OBTAIN RABIES CERT 1ST OFF; Class: INFRACTION; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 828.30-1; Charge Description: AC 14 52 B $120 FAIL TO VACCINATE DOG/CAT 1ST OFF; Class: INFRACTION; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 828.30-A-1; Charge Description: AC 14 54 B FAIL TO OBTAIN RABIES CERT 1ST OFF; Class: INFRACTION; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 828.30-1; Charge Description: AC 14 52 B $120 FAIL TO VACCINATE DOG/CAT 1ST OFF; Class: INFRACTION; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: RYMER VIRGINIA- Badge 2053; Citation Number: 2019AC05810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: RYMER VIRGINIA- Badge 2053; Citation Number: 2019AC05809

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: RYMER VIRGINIA- Badge 2053; Citation Number: 2019AC05808

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: RYMER VIRGINIA- Badge 2053; Citation Number: 2019AC05807

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: RYMER VIRGINIA- Badge 2053; Citation Number: 2019AC05806

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: RYMER VIRGINIA- Badge 2053; Citation Number: 2019AC05805

    Read MoreRead Less