This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 09/18/2021 at 08:46:44 (UTC).

ZANETTA COLLINS VS COURTENAY

Case Summary

On 05/31/2021 ZANETTA COLLINS filed an Other lawsuit against COURTENAY. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEVYON COLLINS ESTATE

Defendants

COURTENAY PALMS LLC

211 Caroline St Ofc, C/O Jeffery W Wells Registered Agent

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-2763

WELLS BOYS GIRLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

C/O Ra Jeffrey Wells, 211 Caroline St

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-2705

Not Yet Classified

COLLINS ZANETTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

SHEPPARD ORLANDO

2886 S Osceola Ave

Orlando, FL 32806-5431

FLETCHER RYAN ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

KEMPGERSTEL ANDREW

44 W Flagler St Fl 25

Miam, FL 33130-1808

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/31/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/31/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/31/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/31/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/31/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/15/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

08/10/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/03/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

08/03/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/30/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED COMPLAINT

07/14/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION

06/07/2021: MOTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/31/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/31/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#41) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#40) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: NEGLIGENT SECURITY; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS BOYS GIRLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COURTENAY PALMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fletcher, Ryan Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheppard, Orlando