This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 11:42:18 (UTC).

YOSELIN PEREZ VS J BESIGNANO

Case Summary

On 02/21/2022 YOSELIN PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against J BESIGNANO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ YOSELIN

Defendants

BESIGNANO JOSEPH

Melbourne, FL 32934

CURRY THOMAS

Melbourne, FL 32934

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIEZARGUELLES CARLOS

505 N Mills Ave

Orlando, FL 32803-5313

Defendant Attorneys

GRINDELL ELIZABETH A

9 Street North Ste 400

St Petersburg, FL 33702

LAPOINTE DOUGLAS J

7680 Universal Blvd Ste 440

Orlando, FL 32819-8915

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFLICT

03/14/2022: NOTICE OF CONFLICT

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/02/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/21/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/21/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

05/03/2022: MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/29/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

04/26/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

04/26/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/06/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/06/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/06/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docket(#19) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less