This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 09:20:03 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE VS DENISE D SMITH

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 WORLDWIDE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DENISE D SMITH. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WAMU

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

4730 S Fort Apache Rd Ste 300

Las Vegas, NV 89147-7947

Defendant

SMITH DENISE D

Las Vegas, NV 89147-7947

Garnishee

BANK AMERICA

C/O Ct Corporation System, 1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY SARAH C

5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760-3951

Garnishee Attorney

NOA JOSEPH A

The Noa Law Firm Pa, Po Box 941958

Miami, FL 33194-1958

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/13/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

08/03/2020: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

06/26/2020: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT SIGNED

03/02/2020: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT SIGNED

RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL

02/26/2020: RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL

NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

02/26/2020: NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/20/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OR JUDGMENT OF FOREIGN COURT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/20/2020: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OR JUDGMENT OF FOREIGN COURT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#10) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S173276; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY WRIT EXECUTION FEE; Amount: $11.82; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RSIEH FLORIDA COST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S173276; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 1501-2500; Amount: $49.26; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RSIEH FLORIDA COST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S173276; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY GARNISHMENT FEE; Amount: $23.92; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RSIEH FLORIDA COST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#9) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketASM: COUNTY WRIT EXECUTION FEE; Amount: 42.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B204776; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: REFUND; Amount: $131.10; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RAUSCH STURM ISRAEL ENERSON HO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: RECOGNIZE FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Disposition Date: 02/20/2020; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL POSTAGE; Amount: 6.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketASM: CO RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketASM: RECORDING THREE PAGES; Amount: 27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OR JUDGMENT OF FOREIGN COURT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less