This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/04/2023 at 02:06:19 (UTC).

WILSHIRE VS J MORENO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 WILSHIRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J MORENO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LLC

WILSHIRE CONSUMER CREDIT

Defendants

MORENO JOSEPH V

Palm Bay, FL 32907-1121

MORENO JOSEPH VINCENT III

Palm Bay, FL 32907-1121

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINTER ROBERT A

7901 Sw 6Th Ct Ste 130

Plantation, FL 33324-3248

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/18/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/18/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/06/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/06/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/06/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

12/16/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234568; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161551273; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WINTER ROBERT A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234568; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161551273; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WINTER ROBERT A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: OTHER NEGLIGENCE $2501 - $5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LLC DBA WILSHIRE CONSUMER CREDIT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTER ROBERT A