This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 01/10/2022 at 07:47:55 (UTC).

WILMINGTON VS ROBERT NOLAN

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 WILMINGTON filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ROBERT NOLAN. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Defendants

NOLAN ROBERT F

Melbourne, FL 32904-9502

NOLAN DIANE K

Melbourne, FL 32904-9502

NOLAN ROBERT F MRS

Melbourne, FL 32904-9502

NOLAN DIANE K MR

Melbourne, FL 32904-9502

CARRIAGE GATE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Co Seth Couslar3735 Peacock Dr

Melbourne, FL 32904-9506

CITIBANK NA

7930 Nw 110Th St

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

8875 Hidden River Pkwy Ste 100C/O Canon Business Process

Tampa, FL 33637-1017

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Melbourne, FL 32904-9502

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Melbourne, FL 32904-9502

Trustees

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

ASPEN GROWTH IV TRUST DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PEREZ ELAYNE M

746 N Magnolia Ave

Orlando, FL 32803-3809

BURR ROBERT B

1550 Southern Blvd Ste 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33406-3236

Trustee Attorney

DUGGAR JASON L

1031 N Miami Beach Blvd

North Miami Beach, FL 33162-3842

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

08/09/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

07/28/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

07/28/2021: ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

07/26/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION

07/22/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/20/2021: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

07/18/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

07/18/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

07/18/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

07/13/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/13/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

07/12/2021: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

07/12/2021: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/01/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S201849; Party: TR 1; Memo: EFILING # 132311980; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DUGGAR JASON L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S200767; Party: TR 1; Memo: EFILING # 131374203; Event Description: PMT: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: $1.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DUGGAR JASON L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S200767; Party: TR 1; Memo: EFILING # 131374203; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DUGGAR JASON L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $0-$50000; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carriage Gate Homeowners Association, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant