This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 09:32:31 (UTC).

WILLIE FRANK WYNN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 WILLIE FRANK WYNN was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA DAVIDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LISA DAVIDSON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN & FAMILIES

375 Commerce Pkwy

Rockledge, FL 32955

Not Yet Classified

WYNN WILLIE FRANK

Palm Bay, FL 32905

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEOLA BRIAN

400 W Robinson St Ste S-1129

Orlando, FL 32801-1707

Not Yet Classified Attorney

JOHNSON WILLIAM A

140 Interlachen Rd Ste B

Melbourne, FL 32940-1995

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:30 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#6) ORDER AUTHORIZING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AND ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PETITION FOR ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER SOCIAL; Disposition Date: 02/12/2020; Disposition Description: CP/MH DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES INTERVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER SOCIAL; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less