Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 15:26:42 (UTC).

WILLIAM VANDYKE VS RED LOBSTER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 WILLIAM VANDYKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RED LOBSTER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDYKE WILLIAM

Defendant

RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3811

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCARPA JOSEPH F JR

7335 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32819-5539

Defendant Attorneys

MENELLO JOSEPH P

390 N Orange Ave Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801-1646

GUTHRIE GARRETT S

390 N Orange Ave Suite 1000

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/01/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/29/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/29/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/29/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

09/29/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

02/22/2021: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/09/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

02/08/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/04/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

01/22/2021: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/11/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

01/11/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/06/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

12/16/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

PRIVILEGE LOG

12/10/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/01/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/23/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#39) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#35) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#32) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENELLO JOSEPH P