This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 01:57:15 (UTC).

WESTLAKE VS LACY RIGGINS

Case Summary

On 12/31/2021 WESTLAKE filed an Other lawsuit against LACY RIGGINS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendant

RIGGINS LACY MICHELLE

Rockledge, FL 32955-4496

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIGH ROBERT A

P O Box 3275

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

12/31/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

COVER SHEET

12/31/2021: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/31/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/31/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/06/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S211364; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 141167535; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: VIGH ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S211364; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 141167535; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: VIGH ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIGH , ROBERT A