This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/03/2020 at 11:29:16 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO VS MARION E SPEAKE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 WELLS FARGO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARION E SPEAKE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

SPEAKE MARION E

Titusville, FL 32780-6641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCENA LISA MARIE

2743 Hollywood Blvd

Hollywood, FL 33020-4821

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/01/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

03/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

03/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

DEFAULT ENTERED

03/16/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

01/24/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/22/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/23/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

DESIGNATION OF MAILING ADDRESS

01/22/2020: DESIGNATION OF MAILING ADDRESS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/22/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 5001 - 8000; Disposition Date: 04/01/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DESIGNATION OF MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less