This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 11:19:09 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO VS MARIO LICOR

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 WELLS FARGO filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against MARIO LICOR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

LICOR MARIO ALFONSO

Titusville, FL 32780-4309

LICOR MARIO A MRS

Titusville, FL 32780-4309

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Titusville, FL 32780-4309

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Titusville, FL 32780-4309

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

1200 S Pine Island Rd, C/O Ct Corporation Registered Agent

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

MORTGAGEIT INC

1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG ANNA J

12425 28Th St N Ste 200

Saint Petersburg, FL 33716-1826

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

04/08/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/04/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

04/11/2022: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

04/08/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S220613; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 149300899; Event Description: PMT: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROSENBERG ANNA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketASM: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGEIT INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD