This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 08:37:11 (UTC).

WATT FAMILY VS USAA CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 WATT FAMILY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WATT FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC LLC

REDDY SUNSHINE

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

MELCHIORRE KATY M

3659 Maguire Blvd Ste 151

Orlando, FL 32803-3028

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/04/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 19-40-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158281; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less