This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/08/2020 at 07:18:51 (UTC).

WATT FAMILY VS SAFECO INS COMP

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 WATT FAMILY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFECO INS COMP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOSTER SONYA

WATT FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC LLC

Defendant

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY ILLINOIS

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/27/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

COVER SHEET

11/25/2019: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158155; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less