This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 09:54:50 (UTC).

WATT FAMILY VS INFINITY INS

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 WATT FAMILY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY INS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAROLD NIKKI FARLEY

WATT FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC LLC

Defendant

INIFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

CUENCA DIEGO J

506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612-3428

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

01/08/2020: ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/08/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/27/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 19-40-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less