This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 09:39:48 (UTC).

VERDIE B COOK VS UNITED

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 VERDIE B COOK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COOK THEODORE

COOK VERDIE B

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Servie Jimmy Patronis Chief Financial Officer, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JUSTUS COREY B

570 Crown Oak Centre Dr

Longwood, FL 32750-6187

DEMING ERIC

20 N Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801-2414

Defendant Attorneys

JACOBS NINA

1201 S Orlando Ave Ste 400

Winter Park, FL 32789-7107

SMYTH CAROLYN

1201 S Orlando Ave Ste 400

Winter Park, FL 32789-7107

SIMON MICHAEL

1201 S Orlando Avenue Suite 400

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

06/10/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/28/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/26/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/31/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#21) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#13) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less