This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:33:56 (UTC).

VELOCITY VS MICHAEL CANESTRARI

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 VELOCITY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL CANESTRARI. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Po Box 788

Wall, NJ 07719

Defendant

CANESTRARI MICHAEL

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3840

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINARSKY AMY J

5104 S West Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611-5650

 

Court Documents

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/27/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158238; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MARCADIS SINGER PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158238; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MARCADIS SINGER PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less