This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 10:16:24 (UTC).

US BANK VS KAREN LINDQUIST

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 US BANK filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KAREN LINDQUIST. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

227 N Bronough St Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1367

LINDQUIST KAREN MARIE

Palm Bay, FL 32909-5014

LINDQUIST KAREN MARIE MR

Palm Bay, FL 32909-5014

UNKNOWN TENANT

Palm Bay, FL 32909-5014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATEL PRATIK R

Po Box 771270

Coral Springs, FL 33077

Defendant Attorney

ZACHEM BETTY C

227 N Bronough St Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1367

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

01/31/2020: MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/25/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/12/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/07/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/31/2020: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163854; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163345; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $40.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163345; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: $9.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163345; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT:FCL >50,000 < 250,000; Amount: $906.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less