This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 09/11/2021 at 10:38:24 (UTC).

US BANK VS DEANN K GROVE

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 US BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DEANN K GROVE. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Defendants

GROVE DEANN K

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

GROVE DEANN

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

GROVE MATTHEW D

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

GROVE MATTHEW

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

GROVE DEANN K MR

GROVE DEANN MR

GROVE MATTHEW D MRS

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

GROVE MATTHEW MRS

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

5351 Nw 106Th Dr

Coral Springs, FL 33076-2793

COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3204

Trustees

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-RPL1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

COOK ROBERT B

4362 Northlake Blvd Ste 213

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410-6270

COLOMBO JOSEPH G S

2020 W Eau Gallie Blvd Ste 106

Melbourne, FL 32935-4022

Trustee Attorney

PECK CHRISTOPHER

3550 Engineering Dr Ste 260

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092-2871

 

Court Documents

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

08/25/2021: ORDER EXTENDING TIME

DEFAULT ENTERED

08/20/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

08/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/13/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

08/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

08/10/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION

08/10/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION

08/06/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/06/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

06/08/2021: CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

06/08/2021: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

06/08/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50001-249999; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-GS3 is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant