This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/25/2023 at 15:02:45 (UTC).

US BANK VS CRAIG A REYNOLDS

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 US BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CRAIG A REYNOLDS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

RCF 2 ACQUISTION TRUST

Defendants

REYNOLDS CRAIG ALEXANDER

REYNOLDS CRAIG A

REYNOLDS CRAIG

REYNOLDS CRAIG MRS ALEXANDER

REYNOLDS CRAIG MRS A

REYNOLDS CRAIG MRS

GLASS SHARON A

GLASS SHARON MR A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACMILLAN GAVIN W

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/22/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/05/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/05/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

03/23/2023: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

COVER SHEET

02/22/2023: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING

02/22/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/22/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/22/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/22/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/22/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/22/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/22/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

02/22/2023: MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/22/2023: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S247127; Party: P 1; Memo: EF 170442711; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S247127; Party: P 1; Memo: EF 170442711; Event Description: PMT: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: $1.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: 1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S240903; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT:FORECLOSURE 50000 OR LESS; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JULIE ANTHOUSIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S240903; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $39.16; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JULIE ANTHOUSIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: FCL-NON-HOMESTEAD $0-$50000; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less