This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 10:16:25 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST VS R ARNOLD

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 US BANK TRUST filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against R ARNOLD. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

ARNOLD RICHARD

Melbourne, FL 32935-3732

CHESTINE REBA

Melbourne, FL 32935-3732

CHESTINE MICHELE

Melbourne, FL 32935-3732

Trustee

US BANK TRUST NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee and Plaintiff Attorney

ARIAS ANDREW

100 W Cypress Creek Rd Ste 1045

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-2191

 

Court Documents

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/21/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/21/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/21/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

02/18/2020: MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/18/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163019; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $30.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHAD MORRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163019; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CHAD MORRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EVICTIONS $0 - $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less