This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 01/18/2022 at 02:17:52 (UTC).

MTGLQ INVESTORS VS KEN HERRON

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 MTGLQ INVESTORS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KEN HERRON. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2020-NPL1

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

Defendants

DIRECT MERCHANTS CREDIT CARD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

1111 N Town Center Dr

Las Vegas, NV 89144-6364

HERRON JENNIFER

Abingdon, MD 21009-1481

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Palm Bay, FL 32909-4656

HERRON BECKY L

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-4267

HERRON KENNETH W

CITIFINANCIAL EQUITY SERVICES INC

300 Saint Paul St

Baltimore, MD 21202

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Palm Bay, FL 32909-4656

BANK AMERICA

C/O Pres Vp Authorized To Accept Service101 S Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28255

HERRON BECKY

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-4267

HERRON CHRISTOPHER

Charlotte, NC 28216-9693

HERRON MELISSA

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689-7031

HERRON AMANDA

Chesapeake, VA 23321-2048

HSBC BANK NEVADA NA

C/O President, Vp, Or Any Other Person Authorized To Accept1111 N Town Center Dr

Las Vegas, NV 89144-6364

HERRON KEN

FIA CARD SERVICES NA

C/O President Or Any Authorized To Accept100 N Tryon St

Charlotte, NC 28202-4000

HARTRICH BECKY L

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-4267

UNKNOWN HEIRS

Trustee

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Trustee Attorney

RUGGERIO JASON KYLE

2807 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804-

Defendant Attorneys

KITE-POWELL JULIA B

Po Box 18645

Tampa, FL 33679-8645

NEIL SHARON L

5745 Sw 75Th St #229

Gainesville, FL 32608-5504

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/18/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/18/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/18/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/18/2021: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

01/05/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

FORECLOSURE BID SHEET

01/05/2022: FORECLOSURE BID SHEET

PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE

12/06/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE >$50,000 AND <$250,000 RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

11/10/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE >$50,000 AND <$250,000 RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF SALE

11/10/2021: NOTICE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

11/10/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

11/08/2021: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/29/2021: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

10/18/2021: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:00 AM; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE CLERK; Matter Type: FORECLOSURE SALE; Result: CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 3; Transaction Type: BOND FEE; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $3,277.50; Interest Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: B 210471; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 2; Transaction Type: POST BOND/DEPOSIT; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $218,000.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: B 210471; Suspense Id: 48539; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $218,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 683957; Bond Type: REGISTRY DEPOSIT; Amount: $218,000.00; Status: OPEN; Balance: $218,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B210472; Party: TB 1; Memo: FCL SALE AMT$218,000.00; Event Description: PMT: DOC STAMPS; Amount: $1,526.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ZS CONSTRUCTION SERVICE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B210471; Party: TB 1; Event Description: PMT: REGISTRY DEPOSIT; Amount: $218,000.00; Payment Type: CASH BOND; Received From: ZS CONSTRUCTION SERVICE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B210471; Party: TB 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT COURT REG FEE; Amount: $3,277.50; Payment Type: CASH BOND; Received From: ZS CONSTRUCTION SERVICE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B210459; Party: P 2; Event Description: PMT: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE; Amount: $70.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PERFECT ATTENDANCE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketASM: DOC STAMPS; Amount: 1526.00

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50001-249999; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECT MERCHANTS CREDIT CARD BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC BANK NEVADA NATIONAL ASSN is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant