This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 10:26:36 (UTC).

UNITED VS JOEL PERALTA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 UNITED filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JOEL PERALTA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED EXCEL INVESTMENTS INC

Defendants

TORREZ IDALIA

Palm Bay, FL 32907

PERALTA JOEL

Palm Bay, FL 32907

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAIG BONNIE ELLEN

101 S Courtenay Pkwy

Merritt Island, FL 32952

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

02/21/2020: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

02/19/2020: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OR STIPULATION

02/19/2020: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OR STIPULATION

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

02/17/2020: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/11/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

02/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/03/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDSB: REFUND BOND; Amount: 1300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDSB: REFUND BOND; Amount: 1300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 4; Control Number: 283904; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $1,300.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: RELEASED; Payee Name: UNITED EXCEL INVESTMENTS INC; Payee Address1: C/O BONNIE HAIG ESQ; Payee Address2: 101 S COURTNEY PKWY; Payee City State Zip: MERRITT ISLAND FL 329524863; Check Amount: $1,300.00; Check Date: 03/03/2020; Check Number: 820448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 4; Control Number: 283903; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $1,300.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: RELEASED; Payee Name: UNITED EXCEL INVESTMENTS INC; Payee Address1: C/O BONNIE HAIG ESQ; Payee Address2: 101 S COURTENAY PKWY; Payee City State Zip: MERRITT ISLAND FL 329524863; Check Amount: $1,300.00; Check Date: 03/03/2020; Check Number: 820447

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OR STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less