This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 08:38:37 (UTC).

TITUSVILLE VS STANDARD FIRE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 TITUSVILLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STANDARD FIRE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIHM STANIS

TITUSVILLE CHIROPRACTIC INJURY CENTER INC

Defendant

STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

C O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

BLASBERG JOSHUA G

1255 S Military Trl Ste 100

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-7618

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/03/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/13/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/14/2020: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/13/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/13/2020: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

01/08/2020: ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/26/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#15) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less