This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 09:19:54 (UTC).

TITUSVILLE VS PEAK PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 TITUSVILLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TITUSVILLE CHIROPRACTIC & INJURY CENTER INC

SCHNEIDER RAYMOND

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, 200 East Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

CLARK JESSICA Y

7380 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32819-5259

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/12/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/09/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/04/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/27/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REOPEN: SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketREOPEN FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#17) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#13) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less