This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 16:40:18 (UTC).

TITAN FLORIDA VS S RAGHUNANDAN

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 TITAN FLORIDA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against S RAGHUNANDAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TITAN FLORIDA LLC

Defendants

RAGHUNANDAN SATYADEVA

Palm Bay, FL 32907-8601

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC

C/O Corporation Creations Network Inc Ra, 801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3811

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

KALMANSON BARRY

500 N Maitland Ave, #305

Maitland, FL 32751

HANSON JOHN C 2

200 South Biscayne Blvd, Suite 1650

Miami, FL 33131

MARELL WILLIAM J

1601 Forum Pl Ste 1101

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-8104

SOLOMON FERRIS G J

1601 Forum Pl Ste 1101

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-8195

BARTHET ALEXANDER E

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 1800

Miami, FL 33131-5336

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/28/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

02/22/2022: ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

02/08/2022: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

12/21/2021: MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF FILING

12/21/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/06/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S206907; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 137043496; Event Description: PMT: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: $9.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BARTHET ALEXANDER E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE; Amount: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Titan Florida LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLOMON , FERRIS G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALMANSON BARRY