This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/26/2020 at 19:46:23 (UTC).

TD BANK VS PHILLIP W BOBET

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 TD BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PHILLIP W BOBET. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

Defendant

BOBET PHILLIP W

Palm Bay, FL 32905-4349

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTERO ANDRES

1133 S University Dr Fl 2

Plantation, FL 33324-3303

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

08/26/2020: NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

06/15/2020: ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

05/20/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

05/20/2020: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

05/17/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

05/17/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

03/12/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/25/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/24/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE

02/24/2020: NOTICE

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

02/24/2020: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/24/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 5001 - 8000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less