This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 09/27/2021 at 07:40:16 (UTC).

TAX COLLECTOR VS 3-777 LLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 TAX COLLECTOR filed an Other lawsuit against 3-777 LLC. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

A BETTER COPY INC

102 E New Haven Ave

Melbourne, FL 32901-4545

BREVARD EYE CENTER

665 Apollo Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901

BAGEL 13

Powers Ferry Landing6300 Powers Ferry Rd Ste 600-323

Atlanta, GA 30339-4815

AUTO SERVICE CENTER TITUSVILLE

2225 Garden St

Titusville, FL 32796-2543

BELLA DOLCE CUPCAKES FLORAL

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3873

BENEFITS MSW ASSOCIATES INC

192 Rainbow St

Merritt Island, FL 32952-6241

BEACH PLACE GUESTHOUSES

Windermere, FL 34786-7923

AMEX PHARMACY

Melbourne, FL 32901

ARTHUR RUTENBERG HOMES

6013 Farcenda Pl Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-7331

BEEF O BRADYS SATELLITE BEACH

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-3875

ASIAN GOURMET RESTAURANT

459 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6857

BOGIN MUNNS MUNNS PA

Cocoa, FL 32922-7946

BIF SECURITY SERVICES INC

7475 Babcock St Se

Palm Bay, FL 32909-5650

CHARLEYS PHILLY STEAKS

Doral, FL 33178-2305

BENNIGANS MELBOURNE

Melbourne, FL 32940-1278

A WAY OUT BAIL BONDS BREVARD COUNTY

5672 Beaverbrook St

Cocoa, FL 32927-2246

CHARMING CHARLIE 104

Indianapolis, IN 46201

443 HOLDING LLC

3616 Harden Blvd

Lakeland, FL 33803-5938

AMSURG MELBOURNE ANESTHESIA LLC

1A Burton Hills Blvd

Nashville, TN 37215-6187

BLUE FOUNTAIN HOME CARE LLC

2440 Emerson Dr Se

Palm Bay, FL 32909

402 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ABBOTT ANGELA A

4420 S Washington Avenue

Titusville, FL 32780-6646

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/01/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

PETITION OR MOTION FOR ORDER

05/15/2020: PETITION OR MOTION FOR ORDER

FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/23/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:30 AM; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B205476; Party: P 1; Memo: ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $1,077.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BREVARD COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S171244; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ANGELA A ABBOTT ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Disposition Date: 09/23/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: 1077.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION OR MOTION FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BREVARD EYE CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARTHUR RUTENBERG HOMES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABBOTT ANGELA A