This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 11/12/2021 at 07:31:55 (UTC).

TAX COLLECTOR VS 2 GO EXPRESS

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 TAX COLLECTOR filed an Other lawsuit against 2 GO EXPRESS. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Defendants

2 GO EXPRESS

4380 Summer Breeze Way

Kissimmee, FL 34744

2000 AUTO

7200 Dolkina Ct

Suntree, FL 32940-0000

3 777

2665 S Bayshore Dr Unit M102

Miami, FL 33133

443 HOLDINGS LLC

3616 Harden Blvd Suite 132

Lakeland, FL 33803

A S & D INC

C/O Arsc Federal Space & Defense Inc, 7000 Muirkirk Rd Suite 100

Beltsville, MD 20705

A WAY OUT BAIL BONDS BREVARD COUNTY

5672 Beaverbrook St

Cocoa, FL 32927-2246

A + AUTO TOPS

485 E Eau Gallie Blvd

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937

AAA 24 HOUR COIN LAUNDRY

Titusville, FL 32780

ABC LANDCLEARING & DEVELOPMENT INC

1130 Peachtree St

Cocoa, FL 32922-8639

ACAI EXPRESS CAFE

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931-2910

ACES AUTOBODY INC

1901 Danr Drive Ne Suite 2

Palm Bay, FL 32905

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC

820 Palm Bay Rd Ne Ste 110

Palm Bay, FL 32905-6351

ADDINGTON PLACE TITUSVILLE

Ocala, FL 34471

AIRGAIN INC

3611 Valley Centre Dr Suite 150

San Diegio, CA 92130

ALDON BOOKHARDT ROOFING INC

3231 Nottingham Lane

Cocoa, FL 32926

ALEXANDRIA GRILL INC

6300 N Wickham Rd 119

Melbourne, FL 32940

ALIEN TECHNOLOGIES CORP

4210 Dow Rd, Suite A

Melbourne, FL 32934

ALL CITY PLUMBING BREVARD INC

461 Mercer St Nw

Palm Bay, FL 32907

ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO

7630 N Wickham Rd Suite 103

Melbourne, FL 32901

AMANDA NURSERIES LLC

3750 N Highway 1

Cocoa, FL 32926

299 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ABBOTT ANGELA A

4420 S Washington Avenue

Titusville, FL 32780-6646

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/09/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

PETITION OR MOTION FOR ORDER

05/17/2021: PETITION OR MOTION FOR ORDER

FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

07/27/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:15 AM; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B208655; Party: P 1; Memo: WARRANT LIST; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $942.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BREVARD COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S195712; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 126918786; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABBOTT ANGELA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Disposition Date: 07/27/2021; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: 942.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION OR MOTION FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACES AUTOBODY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDON BOOKHARDT ROOFING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC LANDCLEARING DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant