Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/15/2020 at 10:26:14 (UTC).

TAISHING NGO VS EMPIRE AUTO

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 TAISHING NGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EMPIRE AUTO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAISHING NGO

Defendants

EMPIRE AUTO SERVICES LLC

953 17Th St, Co Sanchez Padron Associates Inc Ra

Vero Beach, FL 32960-6217

THARPS TIRE STORE INC

1677 Sienna Dr, Co Tharp Stephen D Ra

Melbourne, FL 32934-9006

ALTANAY AL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARVILLE RYAN

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorneys

POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

301 Se Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-2209

COSBY JEFFREY C

301 Se Ocean Blvd, Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

05/27/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/15/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

05/11/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/28/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

04/20/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/14/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/10/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/09/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/16/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/16/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/12/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/12/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COVER SHEET

12/12/2019: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/12/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/12/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/12/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#21) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#20) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSBY JEFFREY C