This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/29/2020 at 02:13:02 (UTC).

T KAHL AND J KAHL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 T KAHL AND J KAHL was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ and DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KAHL TIA

Mims, FL 32754-5241

KAHL JONATHAN

Titusville, FL 32780-4914

GRAHAM TIA

Mims, FL 32754-5241

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#10) FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#9) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Matter Type: SIMPLIFIED DOM HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCAL:SIMPLIFIED DOM HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: SDOM FILING FEE; Amount: 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less