This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/28/2020 at 09:47:42 (UTC).

T BRENNER VS AVATAR PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 T BRENNER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRENNER DONNA

BRENNER TYR

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIMENEZ S ANTONIO

Po Box 279505

Miramar, FL 33027-9505

Defendant Attorneys

DIAMOND PETER A

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 120N

Hollywood, FL 33021-6742

RUDD MICHAEL P

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 120N

Hollywood, FL 33021-6742

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/30/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

12/04/2019: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/04/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COVER SHEET

11/27/2019: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/27/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/27/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/27/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/27/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/27/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/25/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

02/25/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/20/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/20/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/07/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

01/17/2020: ORDER EXTENDING TIME

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/20/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/19/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#29) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#22) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: RSGN: CASE TYPE CHANGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less