This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 00:31:48 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY VS A MCCOY

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 SYNCHRONY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A MCCOY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

MCCOY ANNIE

Merritt Island, FL 32952-5605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN JESSICA JO

100 2Nd Ave S 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701-4360

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/18/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/18/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/21/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule; Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; User: agr03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234559; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161495270; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: FAGEN JESSICA JO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234559; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161495270; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: FAGEN JESSICA JO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 5001 - 8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J