This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 19:07:19 (UTC).

SUSAN PORTER VS SHAWN RUSSELL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 SUSAN PORTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAWN RUSSELL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT BLAUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT BLAUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTER SUSAN

Defendants

RUSSELL SHAWN

MICHAEL DAVID RILEY CONSTRUCTION INC

MDR CONSTRUCTION INC

HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENTINI MICHAEL R

Defendant Attorneys

WOODS KIMBERLY JONES

RODRIGUEZ RAFAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/04/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

05/01/2023: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/15/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/15/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/14/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/14/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/14/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/01/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/01/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/22/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/21/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF INTENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: SCOTT BLAUE; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less