This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/31/2020 at 07:35:27 (UTC).

SUNTREE MASTER VS R M BARNES

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 SUNTREE MASTER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against R M BARNES. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNTREE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

BARNES MARGRET H

Melbourne, FL 32940-7727

UNKNOWN PARTIES

Melbourne, FL 32940-7727

BARNES RANDALL M

Melbourne, FL 32940-7727

BARNES RUSSELL M

Melbourne, FL 32940-7727

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOSINGER SONIA A

1900 Hickory St Ste B

Melbourne, FL 32901-4664

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

11/25/2019: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/27/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/04/2020: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED

01/10/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/06/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/05/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/05/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/05/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:15 AM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S161064; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SONIA BOSINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE; Amount: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less